Assembly | 08/25/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5139.) | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/01/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5643.) | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Introduced. To print. |