Assembly | 09/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2016 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 11. Page 6218.). | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2016 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 5237.) | ||
Senate | 08/19/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 9). | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 11. Page 5484.) | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 21). | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Introduced. To print. |