Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2015 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 856.) | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2015 | Introduced. To print. |