LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR7
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR7
Compare Versions
AJR7 Chaptered July 21, 2015
AJR7 Enrolled July 9, 2015
AJR7 Amended May 22, 2015
AJR7 Amended May 14, 2015
AJR7 Amended April 21, 2015
AJR7 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AJR7 Chaptered July 21, 2015
AJR7 Enrolled July 9, 2015
AJR7 Amended May 22, 2015
AJR7 Amended May 14, 2015
AJR7 Amended April 21, 2015
AJR7 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare