LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR36
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR36
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR36
Action History
Assembly
03/01/2016
Measure version as amended on February 29 corrected.
Assembly
02/29/2016
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 3764.).
Assembly
02/25/2016
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 25).
Assembly
02/18/2016
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
02/11/2016
Introduced.