LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR4
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR4
Action History
Assembly
04/27/2015
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1139.).
Assembly
04/20/2015
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20).
Assembly
04/09/2015
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
04/08/2015
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
Assembly
01/16/2015
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
01/05/2015
Introduced.