LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR47
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR47
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR47
Action History
Assembly
04/21/2016
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4456.).
Assembly
04/14/2016
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14).
Assembly
04/13/2016
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
04/12/2016
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
Assembly
04/07/2016
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
04/04/2016
Introduced.