LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR50
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR50
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR50
Action History
Assembly
05/23/2016
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4905.).
Assembly
05/19/2016
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 19).
Assembly
05/17/2016
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
05/16/2016
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
Assembly
05/02/2016
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
04/27/2016
Introduced.