LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR52
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR52
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR52
Action History
Assembly
05/27/2016
Read. Adopted. (Page 4957.).
Assembly
05/26/2016
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
Assembly
05/25/2016
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 24).
Assembly
05/23/2016
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Assembly
05/17/2016
Introduced.