|
06/10/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4125.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 5048.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1300.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|