|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 587, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5586.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 6532.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 4100.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4001.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3642.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3420.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|