|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 865, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5423.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 6015.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
June 21 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4140.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4001.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3521.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|