07/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2016. | |||
07/01/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/29/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4506.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 3532.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3336.) (March 29). | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |