Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3335.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|