|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 717, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5890.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3807.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3741.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3492.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|