Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3612.) (April 19). | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |