|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 315, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 5901.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 3708.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3421.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|