Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5954.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 8. Page 3929.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3610.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|