Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | April 26 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | April 6 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 3419.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |