Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2016 | June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3841.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3495.) (April 12). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |