|
08/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 232, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5778.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3629.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3335.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|