LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB103
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB103
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB103
Compare Versions
SB103 Chaptered September 22, 2015
SB103 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB103 Amended August 25, 2015
SB103 Amended August 24, 2015
SB103 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB103 Chaptered September 22, 2015
SB103 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB103 Amended August 25, 2015
SB103 Amended August 24, 2015
SB103 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare