California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill May 19, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016