Senate | 11/30/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | April 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3616.) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3393.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |