07/01/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2016. | |||
07/01/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/29/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5486.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3432.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3332.) (March 30). | ||
Senate | 03/11/2016 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |