California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1039 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 25, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016