Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on the inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 27. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2015 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 387.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | From committee: Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |