California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016