California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1044 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill June 13, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016