|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 718, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5403.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6077.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cooper. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3631.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3395.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|