Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mitchell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (September 11). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3163.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2892.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 11.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 388.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
From committee: Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|