Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3712.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|