LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB107
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB107
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB107
Compare Versions
SB107 Chaptered September 22, 2015
SB107 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB107 Amended September 10, 2015
SB107 Amended September 4, 2015
SB107 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB107 Chaptered September 22, 2015
SB107 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB107 Amended September 10, 2015
SB107 Amended September 4, 2015
SB107 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare