Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2016 | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 3845.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3613.) (April 19). | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |