Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3607.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |