California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1072 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016