California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1073 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016