Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2016 | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2016 | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4042.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4003.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3395.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |