|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 723, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 5370.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 6016.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 4.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 3842.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3741.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3559.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|