|
07/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4548.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5487.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3871.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|