California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1098 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016