|
04/19/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2205.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 2528.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From consent calendar by Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1020.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 594.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|