Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on the inactive file. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Monning. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4003.) (May 27). | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3645.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3421.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |