Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2016 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3591.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Set for hearing April 18 in B., P. & E.D. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |