|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 784, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 5362.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 5883.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3843.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3698.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3392.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|