|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 482, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5430.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5901.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cooper. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3713.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3493.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|