California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1120 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/15/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1120AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 15, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 13, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wolk FEBRUARY 17, 2016 An act to amend Sections 14670.2 and 14672.1 of the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1120, as amended, Wolk. Director of General Services: state medical facilities: leases. (1) Existing law authorizes the Director of General Services, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals  ,  to lease specified property  not exceeding 10 acres  located within the Napa State Hospital to a  nonprofit corporation   public governmental agency  for the purpose of conducting its trainable mentally retarded program consistent with specified requirements. This bill would update the names of the programs being  offered   offered, would increase the allowable acreage to 10.5 acres,  and would authorize the lease  or leases  to be renewed for a term not exceeding 50 years. (2) Existing law authorizes the Director of General Services, with the consent of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, to lease specified property located within  to  the Medical Facility at Vacaville to a nonprofit corporation for the purpose of conducting an educational and work program for persons with intellectual disabilities consistent with specified requirements. Existing law authorizes the nonprofit corporation receiving the lease to assign or sublet to a public agency, with the approval of the Director of General Services and the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. This bill would  instead   additionally  authorize the director to lease property  adjacent to   within  the medical facility to a public governmental  agency under the same terms.   agency. The bill would prohibit a renewed lease under these provisions from being assigned.  The bill would update the names of the programs being offered. The bill would authorize the lease to be renewed for a term not exceeding 50 years.  The bill would   require the Director of General Services to review the lease every 5 years, as specified.  The bill would also make technical and conforming changes to these provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14670.2 of the Government Code is amended to read: 14670.2. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services, with the consent of the State Department of State Hospitals, may, in the best interests of the state, let to a public governmental agency, for the purpose of locating and conducting its special needs and alternative education programs, and for locating and conducting a child-care facility, and for a period not to exceed 50 years, real property not exceeding  10   10.5  acres located within the grounds of the Napa State Hospital. For the additional purpose of establishing an educational park, the director may, with the consent of the department, renegotiate the  lease,   lease or leases,  for a period not to exceed 50 years, which period shall commence January 1, 1993. For the purposes of this section, "educational park" means a conglomerate of educational services, including, but not limited to, a children's center, a preschool for severely disabled children, adult educational services, administrative offices, a community school, and a media services building. The lease  or leases  provided for in this section may be renewed for an additional period, not to exceed 50 years. The lease  or leases  authorized by this section shall be nonassignable and shall be subject to periodic review every five years. That review shall be made by the Director of General Services, who shall do both of the following: (a)  Assure the state  Review the lessee's performance of the terms of the lease to confirm that  the purposes of the lease  or leases  are being carried out. (b) Determine what, if any, adjustment should be made in the terms of the  lease.   lease or leases.  SEC. 2. Section 14672.1 of the Government Code is amended to read: 14672.1. Notwithstanding Section 14670, the Director of General Services, with the consent of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, may let to a nonprofit corporation or a public governmental agency, for the purpose of conducting its special needs and alternative education programs, and for a period not to exceed 50 years, real property not exceeding 10 acres, located  adjacent to the grounds   within the grounds  of the Medical Facility at Vacaville, California. The lease provided for in this section may be renewed for an additional period not to exceed 50 years.  A lease executed pursuant to this section may be assigned or sublet in whole or in part by the lessee nonprofit corporation or public entity to any public governmental agency with the approval of the Director of General Services and the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation.   The renewed lease authorized by this section shall be nonassignable and shall be subject to periodic review every five years. That review shall be made by the Director of General Services, who shall do both of the following:   (a) Review the lessee's performance of the terms of the lease to confirm that the purposes of the lease are being carried out.   (b) Determine what, if any, adjustment should be made in the terms of the lease.