06/27/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2016. | |||
06/27/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/20/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5401.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 3429.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3336.) (March 29). | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |