|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5527.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6021.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5474.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4044.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4004.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
April 18 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|