|
08/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 235, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4881.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5719.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3549.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3313.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|